FL S2752 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for codification of special laws relating to the Citrus County Hospital Board, an independent special district in Citrus County. Codifies, amends, and reenacts chapter 99-442, Laws of Florida, as amended, as the "Citrus County Hospital and Medical Nursing and Convalescent Home Act." Authorizes the board to enter into a lease or contract with a not-for-profit corporation for the purpose of operating and managing the hospital, etc.
Title
Citrus County [EPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0024 - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died on Calendar | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading -HJ 01173 | |
2010-04-26 | Received -HJ 01114; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01114 | |
2010-04-21 | In Messages | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00683; Amendment(s) adopted (825154, 776200, 652222, 447414, 332964) -SJ 00683; Read 3rd time -SJ 00684; CS passed as amended (825154, 776200, 652222, 447414, 332964); YEAS 36 NAYS 0 -SJ 00684; Immediately certified -SJ 00684 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00552 | |
2010-04-13 | CS by- Health Regulation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00552; CS read 1st time on 04/14/10 -SJ 00569; Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-09 | Now in Health Regulation -SJ 00523; On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 04/13/10, 9:15 am, 412-K | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Community Affairs (213308); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00523; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-23 | Introduced -SJ 00321; Referred to Community Affairs; Health Regulation -SJ 00321 | |
2010-03-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1475 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)