FL S2704 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes an amendment to the State Constitution relating to guaranteeing the right to vote by secret ballot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Right to Vote by Secret Ballot [GPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
2010-03-11 Introduced -SJ 00229
2010-03-09 Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; Rules -SJ 00229
2010-02-27 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00128Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback