FL S2600 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain municipalities from certain capital improvements element and schedule update requirements and certain comprehensive plan amendment prohibitions under certain circumstances. Exempts certain municipalities from certain water supply element requirements for future land use principles and guidelines. Revises a municipal revenue criterion relating to annual financial audit requirements, etc.
Title
Local Government Comprehensive Plans [EPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Community Affairs | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00221 | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Transportation -SJ 00221 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1577 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0163 | 3177 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0163 | 3191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0218 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |