FL S2594 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the terms "paintball gun" and "paintball marker." Prohibits a person from carrying a paintball gun or paintball marker in a vehicle on a highway. Provides specified exceptions. Provides that the act does not apply to a commercial paintball field, range, or course when passengers are transported to and from designated player areas. Provides that a violation of the act is a first-degree misdemeanor.
Title
Paintball Guns and Markers [CPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Siplin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Transportation | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00221 | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Transportation; Commerce; Criminal Justice -SJ 00221 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |