FL S2592 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Read 3rd time -SJ 01187; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1385 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 01187; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147) -SJ 01187
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Read 3rd time -SJ 01187; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1385 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 01187; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147) -SJ 01187
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the installation of fuel tank upgrades to secondary containment systems to be completed by specified deadlines. Revises provisions relating to petroleum contamination site selection and cleanup criteria. Deletes obsolete provisions relating to funding for limited interim soil-source removals. Provides for natural attenuation and active remediation of sites, etc.
Title
Petroleum Contamination Site Cleanup [EPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Carey Baker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Read 3rd time -SJ 01187; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1385 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 01187; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147) -SJ 01187 | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01003; Was taken up -SJ 01013; Amendment(s) adopted (505436, 304852) -SJ 01013; Amendment(s) failed -SJ 01013; Ordered engrossed -SJ 01014 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-27 | Withdrawn from General Government Appropriations -SJ 00920; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-04-16 | Now in General Government Appropriations -SJ 00599 | |
2010-04-15 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-14 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00599; CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -SJ 00615 | |
2010-04-09 | Now in Community Affairs -SJ 00523; On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/14/10, 9:30 am, 412-K | |
2010-04-08 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable with 2 amendment(s) by Transportation (103334, 809754); YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00523 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 37-S | |
2010-03-24 | Now in Transportation -SJ 00333 | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00333 | |
2010-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/23/10, 1:15 pm, 401-S | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00221 | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Transportation; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00221 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1385 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00010; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H1509 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 1752; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2010-136), CS/SB 1118 (Ch. 2010-208), CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147) -HJ 01135
S1752 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-147; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 173 (Ch. 2010-128), CS/HB 969 (Ch. 2010-222), CS/CS/HB 1389 (Ch. 2010-226), CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2010-136), CS/HB 7205 (Ch. 2010-140), CS/SB 1118 (Ch. 2010-208)
H1509 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 1752; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2010-136), CS/SB 1118 (Ch. 2010-208), CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147) -HJ 01135
S1752 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-147; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 173 (Ch. 2010-128), CS/HB 969 (Ch. 2010-222), CS/CS/HB 1389 (Ch. 2010-226), CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2010-136), CS/HB 7205 (Ch. 2010-140), CS/SB 1118 (Ch. 2010-208)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0215 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0376 | 3071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |