FL S2550 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the State Constitution to provide that an individual may not be barred from participating in any public program because of choosing to use public benefits at a religious provider and to delete a prohibition against using public revenues in aid of any church, sect, or religious denomination or any sectarian institution.
Title
Religious Freedom [SPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Rules | |
2010-04-13 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 -SJ 00551; Now in Rules -SJ 00551 | |
2010-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/13/10, 9:15 am, 110-S | |
2010-04-07 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 6 NAYS 2 -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 04/06/10, 1:00 pm, 301-S | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00218 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Judiciary; Rules -SJ 00218 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1399 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Rules and Calendar Council