FL S2548 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-16 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00623; Substituted CS/HB 1281 -SJ 00623; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1281 (Ch. 2010-67) -SJ 00623
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-16 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00623; Substituted CS/HB 1281 -SJ 00623; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1281 (Ch. 2010-67) -SJ 00623
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Reenacts a reference to certain federal laws for purposes of incorporating rules adopted under such laws. Specifies application of disciplinary procedures to principal loan originators for actions of loan originators. Specifies nonapplication of certain limitations to licensed loan originators operating solely as loan processors. Removes the requirement for licensure application under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Loan Origination [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00623; Substituted CS/HB 1281 -SJ 00623; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1281 (Ch. 2010-67) -SJ 00623 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00584 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable by- Commerce; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-02 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 401-S | |
2010-03-30 | Now in Commerce -SJ 00344 | |
2010-03-25 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-24 | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00344; CS read 1st time on 03/25/10 -SJ 00348 | |
2010-03-19 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/24/10, 1:15 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00218 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce -SJ 00218 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1281 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-67
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0494 | 00255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0494 | 00331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0494 | 0038 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0494 | 0067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |