FL S2526 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that the Department of Financial Services Tobacco Settlement Clearing Trust Fund shall be referred to as the "Lawton Chiles Trust Fund"; providing an appropriation to the Board of Directors of the H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center and Research Institute for a specified purpose; authorizing pharmacists and wholesalers employed by or under contract with forensic facilities managed by the Agency for Persons with Disabilities to import prescription drugs under the Canadian Prescription Drug Importation Program for dispensing to clients in such facilities; requiring that the Department of Children and Families' contracts with managing entities be made available on the department's website, etc.
Title
Health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#893 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#552 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#552 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Chapter No. 2022-150 | |
2022-06-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-06-02 | Governor vetoed specific Line Item(s) | |
2022-06-02 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2022-03-14 | House | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 107, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-14 | House | Conference Committee Report adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Amendment 106720 adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Conference Committee Report considered |
2022-03-14 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-14 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 33 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Conference Committee Report adopted (106720) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Conference Committee Report received |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference Committee appointed |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill placed in Conference (Health Care Appropriations Conference Committee) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations: Stargel (Chair), Bean (At Large), Book (At Large), Gibson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Passidomo (At Large), Perry (At Large), Powell (At Large), Rouson (At Large), Stewart (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Albritton (Chair), Ausley, Berman, Boyd, Bradley, Brodeur, Garcia, Mayfield, Rodrigues, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/State Administration and Technology: Albritton (Chair), Ausley, Berman, Boyd, Bradley, Brodeur, Garcia, Mayfield, Rodrigues, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Perry (Chair), Baxley, Bracy, Gainer, Pizzo, Rodriguez, Torres, Wright; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/Higher Education: Broxson (Chair), Cruz, Diaz, Gibson, Gruters, Hutson, Passidomo, Polsky; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/PreK-12: Broxson (Chair), Cruz, Diaz, Gibson, Gruters, Hutson, Passidomo, Polsky; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Bean (Chair), Book, Brodeur, Burgess, Diaz, Farmer, Harrell, Jones, Rodrigues, Rodriguez, Rouson; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Infrastructure and Tourism: Gainer (Chair), Ausley, Boyd, Cruz, Garcia, Gibson, Hooper, Mayfield, Perry, Taddeo, Wright; |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | In returning messages |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed the Senate bill as amended by House and we accede to conference |
2022-02-22 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | House | Amendment 016339 adopted |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022) |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-17 | Senate | The Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
H5001 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-156
S2500 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
S2500 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 02035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |