FL S2524 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Land Acquisition Trust Fund within the Department of Transportation; providing for the purpose of the trust fund and sources of funds; requiring that title to lands or related property interests acquired be vested by the state; requiring the department or its designee to manage lands or related property interests acquired in accordance with the purposes set forth in s. 28, Art. X of the State Constitution; providing for future review and termination or re-creation of the trust fund, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Acquisition Trust Fund/Department of Transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#409 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19SenateDied in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
2015-06-05SenateConference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Lee (Chair), Benacquisto (Vice Chair), Flores (At Large), Galvano (At Large), Grimsley (At Large), Joyner (At Large), Margolis (At Large), Richter (At Large), Simmons (At Large), Smith (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Negron (Chair), Bradley, Evers, Flores, Hutson, Joyner; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/Education: Gaetz (Chair), Bullard, Galvano, Legg, Montford, Simmons, Stargel; Appropriations Conference Committee on General Government/Government Operations: Hays (Chair), Altman, Braynon, Dean, Margolis, Simpson; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Garcia (Chair), Bean, Benacquisto, Grimsley, Richter, Smith, Sobel; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Transportation and Economic Development: Latvala (Chair), Brandes, Clemens, Detert, Diaz de la Portilla, Gibson, Hukill, Sachs, Thompson
2015-06-04SenateIn returning messages
2015-06-04HouseRefused to pass the Senate bill as passed by the Senate and acceded to the request for conference
2015-06-04HousePassed as amended; YEAS 106 NAYS 0
2015-06-04HouseRead 3rd time
2015-06-04HouseAmendment(s) adopted (232881)
2015-06-04HouseRead 2nd time
2015-06-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15
2015-06-03HouseReceived
2015-06-03HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-06-01HouseIn Messages
2015-06-01SenateThe Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference
2015-06-01SenatePassed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2015-06-01SenateRead 3rd time
2015-06-01SenateRead 2nd time
2015-06-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-06-01SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2015-06-01SenateReferred to Appropriations
2015-06-01SenateIntroduced
2015-05-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2500 (Similar To) 2015-08-18 - Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules
H0001 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20232Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback