FL S2516 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-229, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Terminating certain trust funds within the Department of Environmental Protection, the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, and the Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission; providing for the disposition of balances in the trust funds; requiring all outstanding debts or obligations of the terminated trust funds to be paid as required; requiring the Chief Financial Officer to close out and remove the terminated trust funds from the various state accounting systems, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implementation of the Water and Land Conservation Constitutional Amendment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#437 (Y: 93 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#404 (Y: 98 N: 8 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-23 Chapter No. 2015-229, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222)
2015-06-23 Approved by Governor
2015-06-19 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-06-19SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2015-06-19HousePassed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 93 NAYS 20
2015-06-19HouseConference Committee Report adopted (354282)
2015-06-19HouseConference Committee Report considered
2015-06-19HouseIn returning messages
2015-06-19SenatePassed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2015-06-19SenateConference Committee Report adopted (354282)
2015-06-19SenateConference Committee Report received
2015-06-05SenateConference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Lee (Chair), Benacquisto (Vice Chair), Flores (At Large), Galvano (At Large), Grimsley (At Large), Joyner (At Large), Margolis (At Large), Richter (At Large), Simmons (At Large), Smith (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Negron (Chair), Bradley, Evers, Flores, Hutson, Joyner; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/Education: Gaetz (Chair), Bullard, Galvano, Legg, Montford, Simmons, Stargel; Appropriations Conference Committee on General Government/Government Operations: Hays (Chair), Altman, Braynon, Dean, Margolis, Simpson; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Garcia (Chair), Bean, Benacquisto, Grimsley, Richter, Smith, Sobel; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Transportation and Economic Development: Latvala (Chair), Brandes, Clemens, Detert, Diaz de la Portilla, Gibson, Hukill, Sachs, Thompson
2015-06-05HouseConference Committee appointed: Representatives Corcoran (Chair), Boyd (Vice Chair), Albritton (Chair), Broxson, Combee, Gonzalez, La Rosa, Mayfield, Smith, Pilon, Trumbull, Bracy, Jacobs, Powell, Watson, C., Caldwell (At Large), Diaz, J. (At Large), Eisnaugle (At Large), Fresen (At Large), Gaetz (At Large), Goodson (At Large), Hudson (At Large), Ingram (At Large), McBurney (At Large), Metz (At Large), Nunez (At Large), Oliva (At Large), O'Toole (At Large), Porter (At Large), Raschein (At Large), Wood (At Large), Young (At Large), Clarke-Reed (At Large), Cruz (At Large), Jones, M. (At Large), Pafford (At Large), Richardson (At Large), Rouson (At Large), Stafford (At Large), Williams (At Large)
2015-06-04SenateIn returning messages
2015-06-04HouseRefused to pass the Senate bill as passed by the Senate and acceded to the request for conference
2015-06-04HousePassed as amended; YEAS 98 NAYS 8
2015-06-04HouseRead 3rd time
2015-06-04HouseAmendment(s) adopted (272503)
2015-06-04HouseRead 2nd time
2015-06-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15
2015-06-03HouseReceived
2015-06-03HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-06-01HouseIn Messages
2015-06-01SenateThe Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference
2015-06-01SenatePassed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
2015-06-01SenateRead 3rd time
2015-06-01SenateRead 2nd time
2015-06-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-06-01SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2015-06-01SenateReferred to Appropriations
2015-06-01SenateIntroduced
2015-05-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2500 (Similar To) 2015-08-18 - Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules
S2502 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-222, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229)
H0015 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222)
H0001 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16105301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
161054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
161091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1761Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2010205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2113103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21520Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215618Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215619Amended CodeSee Bill Text
253027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
253034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2537824Amended CodeSee Bill Text
258015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
258435Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2591051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2870595Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338250Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3390801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3392818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3392819Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33961Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34358Amended CodeSee Bill Text
369252Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373089Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373129Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3731391Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373199Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373430Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373459Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3734592Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37345926Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373470Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373472Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373584Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37359Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3735905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375044Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
376123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
376307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37640Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379214Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379362Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3800666Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3800677Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380508Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380510Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4030615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40308601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4031651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403885Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4038911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4039325Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40393345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4205092Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209079Amended CodeSee Bill Text
570207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
570321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89509Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback