FL S2508 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing requirements for budget amendments requesting the release of state funds for specified water project components; requiring the South Florida Water Management District to make a specified certification to the Legislature regarding its recommendations to the United States Army Corps of Engineers; authorizing the Department of Environmental Protection to enter into agreements or contracts with certain entities to expedite the evaluation of certain environmental permits; specifying that the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services may acquire land or certain related interests in land for specified public purposes, etc.
Title
Environmental Resources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#895 (Y: 99 N: 8 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#544 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#544 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-06-02 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2022-03-14 | House | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 99, NAYS 8 |
2022-03-14 | House | Conference Committee Report adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Amendment 760174 adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Conference Committee Report considered |
2022-03-14 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-14 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 33 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Conference Committee Report adopted (760174) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Conference Committee Report received |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference Committee appointed |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill placed in Conference (Agriculture & Natural Resources Conference Committee) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations: Stargel (Chair), Bean (At Large), Book (At Large), Gibson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Passidomo (At Large), Perry (At Large), Powell (At Large), Rouson (At Large), Stewart (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Albritton (Chair), Ausley, Berman, Boyd, Bradley, Brodeur, Garcia, Mayfield, Rodrigues, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/State Administration and Technology: Albritton (Chair), Ausley, Berman, Boyd, Bradley, Brodeur, Garcia, Mayfield, Rodrigues, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Perry (Chair), Baxley, Bracy, Gainer, Pizzo, Rodriguez, Torres, Wright; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/Higher Education: Broxson (Chair), Cruz, Diaz, Gibson, Gruters, Hutson, Passidomo, Polsky; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/PreK-12: Broxson (Chair), Cruz, Diaz, Gibson, Gruters, Hutson, Passidomo, Polsky; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Bean (Chair), Book, Brodeur, Burgess, Diaz, Farmer, Harrell, Jones, Rodrigues, Rodriguez, Rouson; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Infrastructure and Tourism: Gainer (Chair), Ausley, Boyd, Cruz, Garcia, Gibson, Hooper, Mayfield, Perry, Taddeo, Wright; |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | In returning messages |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed the Senate bill as amended by House and we accede to conference |
2022-02-22 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | House | Amendment 981363 adopted |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022) |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-17 | Senate | The Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 2 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (533620) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 4 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
H5001 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-156
S2500 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
S2500 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 1501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 4141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 93 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |