FL S2466 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits severance pay for nonelected public officers except under specified circumstances. Prohibits certain limitations on discussing an employment dispute or settlement.
Title
Public Officers [WPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Community Affairs | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00211 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00211 | |
2010-02-25 | Filed |