FL S2448 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Redefines the term "electric personal assistive mobility device" to include additional devices for transporting one person. Authorizes local governments to regulate certain vehicles and other motorized devices operating on sidewalks. Exempts motorized wheelchairs from certain ordinances. Authorizes local governments to enact ordinances permitting the use of golf carts on sidewalks, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Operation [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0019 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
2010-04-27 In Messages
2010-04-27 Read 3rd time -SJ 00892; CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 1 -SJ 00892
2010-04-26 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00856
2010-04-21 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00703
2010-04-20 CS by- Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00703; CS read 1st time on 04/20/10 -SJ 00655; Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-15 On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/20/10, 1:00 pm, 412-K
2010-04-14 Now in Community Affairs -SJ 00550
2010-04-13 Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00550
2010-04-08 On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/13/10, 12:30 pm, 37-S
2010-03-11 Introduced -SJ 00210
2010-03-04 Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs -SJ 00210
2010-02-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H1419 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0971 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-223; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 263 (Ch. 2010-82), CS/CS/CS/HB 631 (Ch. 2010-198), CS/HB 795 (Ch. 2010-107)
S0482 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 631 (Ch. 2010-198), CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0316008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03161995Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0316212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03162128Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback