FL S2442 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7237 (Ch. 2010-78)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7237 (Ch. 2010-78)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the powers and duties of the Board of Governors relating to accountability. Requires that the board align the missions of each constituent university. Revises provisions that require a Florida college to provide notice of its intent to propose a baccalaureate degree program, etc.
Title
State University System [SPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7237 (Ch. 2010-78) | |
2010-04-09 | Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00525 | |
2010-04-07 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-06 | CS/CS by Higher Education Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00525; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00546 | |
2010-04-01 | Now in Higher Education Appropriations -SJ 00350; On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 117-K | |
2010-03-26 | CS by Higher Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00350; CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -SJ 00367; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education, 03/26/10, 8:00 am, 301-S | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00210 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Higher Education; Higher Education Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00210 | |
2010-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1786 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00903; Amendment(s) adopted (611744, 369372) -SJ 00904; Substituted HB 7237 -SJ 00904; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7237 (Ch. 2010-78) -SJ 00904
H7237 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-78
H7237 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-78
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 226 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |