FL S2420 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the State Constitution to limit state revenues and require voter approval of new taxes and fees.
Title
State Revenues/Voter Approval New Taxes and Fees [WPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Finance and Tax | |
2010-04-08 | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00523; Now in Finance and Tax | |
2010-03-30 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00333 | |
2010-03-24 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-23 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 -SJ 00333; CS read 1st time on 03/24/10 -SJ 00334 | |
2010-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/23/10, 1:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00207 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00207 | |
2010-02-25 | Filed |