FL S2288 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00941; Amendment(s) adopted (476040) -SJ 00941; Substituted HJR 7231 -SJ 00942; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 7231 (Passed) -SJ 00942
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00941; Amendment(s) adopted (476040) -SJ 00941; Substituted HJR 7231 -SJ 00942; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 7231 (Passed) -SJ 00942
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the State Constitution to provide standards for establishing legislative and congressional district boundaries.
Title
Legislative and Congressional District Boundaries [GPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00941; Amendment(s) adopted (476040) -SJ 00941; Substituted HJR 7231 -SJ 00942; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 7231 (Passed) -SJ 00942 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-23 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00796 | |
2010-04-22 | CS/CS by- Ethics and Elections; YEAS 6 NAYS 2 -SJ 00796; CS read 1st time on 04/23/10 -SJ 00797 | |
2010-04-21 | Original reference(s) removed: Rules; Now in Ethics and Elections -SJ 00716; On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 04/22/10, 12:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-04-16 | CS by Reapportionment; YEAS 9 NAYS 3 -SJ 00651; CS read 1st time on 04/20/10 -SJ 00655; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-13 | On Committee agenda-- Reapportionment, 04/16/10, 1:30 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00197 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Reapportionment; Ethics and Elections; Rules -SJ 00197 | |
2010-02-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7231 (Same As) 2010-05-18 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State