FL S2204 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the State Constitution relating to the duties of the Chief Financial Officer.
Title
Chief Financial Officer Duties [WPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. JD Alexander [R] | Sen. Victor Crist [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0002 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-04-15 | In Messages | |
2010-04-08 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00516; Amendment(s) adopted (598308) -SJ 00516; CS passed as amended (598308); YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00516 | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00509 | |
2010-03-22 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Original reference(s) removed: Rules; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00309 | |
2010-03-19 | CS by Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 -SJ 00280; CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -SJ 00297 | |
2010-03-16 | On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 03/19/10, 1:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 03/18/10, 3:15 pm, 412-K --Not considered | |
2010-03-11 | Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00189; On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 03/16/10, 4:00 pm, 412-K --Not considered | |
2010-03-10 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00189 | |
2010-03-05 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/10/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00149 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules | |
2010-02-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2206 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages