FL S2190 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00995; Substituted HB 545 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00995; Laid on Table -SJ 00995
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00995; Substituted HB 545 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00995; Laid on Table -SJ 00995
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals a specified provision relating to sales of residential property in wind-borne debris regions and required disclosures of windstorm mitigation ratings to purchasers.
Title
Residential Property Sales [CPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00995; Substituted HB 545 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00995; Laid on Table -SJ 00995 | |
2010-04-28 | Withdrawn from General Government Appropriations -SJ 00925; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading; Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-22 | Withdrawn from Regulated Industries -SJ 00750; Now in General Government Appropriations | |
2010-03-25 | Now in Regulated Industries -SJ 00344 | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00344 | |
2010-03-19 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/24/10, 1:15 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Banking and Insurance; Regulated Industries; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00148 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Regulated Industries; General Government Appropriations | |
2010-02-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0545 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00009; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016