FL S2188 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00837; Amendment(s) adopted (903594) -SJ 00837; Substituted HB 7079 -SJ 00837; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7079 (Ch. 2010-115), HB 7123 (Ch. 2010-42) -SJ 00837
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00837; Amendment(s) adopted (903594) -SJ 00837; Substituted HB 7079 -SJ 00837; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7079 (Ch. 2010-115), HB 7123 (Ch. 2010-42) -SJ 00837
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions relating to an exemption from public records requirements for certain information regarding voters and voter registration and for signatures of voters and voter registration applicants. Creates said exemption for specified personal identifying information of stalking victims held by the Attorney General or contained in voter registration and voting records held by the supervisor of elections or the Department of State, etc.
Title
OGSR/Voters and Voter Registration/Signatures [GPSC]
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00837; Amendment(s) adopted (903594) -SJ 00837; Substituted HB 7079 -SJ 00837; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7079 (Ch. 2010-115), HB 7123 (Ch. 2010-42) -SJ 00837 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-16 | Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-09 | Original reference(s) removed: Rules; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-04-07 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-06 | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00526; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00544 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/06/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-22 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00279 | |
2010-03-19 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-18 | CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00279; CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -SJ 00296 | |
2010-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/18/10, 8:00 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules -SJ 00148 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | |
2010-02-18 | SPB 7070 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2188) by Ethics and Elections; Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0882 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00662; Substituted HB 7123 -SJ 00662; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7123 (Ch. 2010-42), HB 7079 (Ch. 2010-115) -SJ 00662
H7079 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-115; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7123 (Ch. 2010-42)
H7123 (Similar To) 2010-05-07 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-42; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7079 (Ch. 2010-115)
H7079 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-115; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7123 (Ch. 2010-42)
H7123 (Similar To) 2010-05-07 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-42; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7079 (Ch. 2010-115)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0097 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0741 | 465 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |