FL S2162 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1832
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1832
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Welfare Transition Trust Fund within the Department of Education. Provides for sources of funds and purposes. Provides for future review and termination or re-creation of the trust fund.
Title
Welfare Transition Trust Fund/DOE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#150 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1832 | |
2011-05-06 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-06 | Conference Committee Report received -SJ 1154 | |
2011-04-26 | Conference Committee appointed: Representative Legg -HJ 778 | |
2011-04-26 | ||
2011-04-07 | In returning messages | |
2011-04-07 | In Messages | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time -SJ 434 | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -SJ 384 | |
2011-04-05 | Introduced -SJ 337 | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 337 | |
2011-04-01 | SPB 7208 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2162) by Budget |