FL S2160 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1832
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1832
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates motor carrier weight inspection as an area of program responsibility within the Department of Transportation, which replaces motor carrier compliance. Revises the divisions within the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles. Creates the Office of Motor Carrier Compliance of the Division of the Florida Highway Patrol within the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles. Requires the department rather than the Division of Motor Vehicles to issue special motor vehicle license plates, etc.
Title
Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#179 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1832 | |
2011-05-06 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-06 | Conference Committee Report received -SJ 1143 | |
2011-04-26 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Horner (Chair), Berman, Bernard, Brandes, Broxson, Caldwell, Dorworth, Drake, Ray, Rogers, Workman -HJ 778 | |
2011-04-26 | ||
2011-04-07 | In returning messages | |
2011-04-07 | In Messages | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time -SJ 433 | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -SJ 384 | |
2011-04-05 | Introduced -SJ 337 | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 337 | |
2011-04-01 | SPB 7206 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2160) by Budget |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 1957 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 3025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 3026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 516 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 613 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 640 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
321 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
321 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
334 | 044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |