FL S2154 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1832
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1832
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Federal Grants Trust Fund within the Executive Office of the Governor. Provides for sources of funds and purposes. Provides for annual carryforward of trust fund balances. Provides for future review and termination or re-creation of the trust fund.
Title
Federal Grants Trust Fund/EOG
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1832 | |
2011-05-06 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-06 | Conference Committee Report received -SJ 1155 | |
2011-04-26 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Horner (Chair), Berman, Bernard, Brandes, Broxson, Caldwell, Dorworth, Drake, Ray, Rogers, Workman -HJ 778 | |
2011-04-26 | ||
2011-04-07 | In returning messages | |
2011-04-07 | In Messages | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time -SJ 430 | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -SJ 376 | |
2011-04-05 | Introduced -SJ 334 | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 335 | |
2011-04-01 | SPB 7200 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2154) by Budget |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
201 | 0205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
201 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 0003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 0004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 0005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 508 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5088 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 526 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 529 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 622 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 631 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9079 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |