FL S2144 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the minimum staffing requirements for nursing homes. Requires that the Agency for Health Care Administration deny an applicant for a license or license renewal of an applicant, a controlling interest of the applicant, or any entity in which a controlling interest of the applicant was an owner or officer during the occurrence of certain actions. Repeals the sunset of provisions authorizing the federal waiver for certain persons age 65 and older or who have a disability, etc.
Title
Medicaid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#175 (Y: 79 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848 | |
2011-05-06 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-06 | Conference Committee Report received -SJ 1502 | |
2011-04-26 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Hudson (Chair), Chestnut, Corcoran, Davis, Diaz, Frishe, Harrell, Jones, Pafford, Roberson, K, Steube, Wood, Young -HJ 778 | |
2011-04-26 | ||
2011-04-07 | In returning messages | |
2011-04-07 | In Messages | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time -SJ 424 | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -SJ 372 | |
2011-04-05 | Introduced -SJ 332 | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 332 | |
2011-04-01 | SPB 7174 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2144) by Budget |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
636 | 0145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |