FL S2142 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Removes obsolete provisions. Requires the Legislature to annually review the preliminary budget and authorized millage rate for each water management district and set the amount of revenue a district may raise through its ad valorem tax authority. Provides for the maximum amount of property tax raised by a district to revert to the amount authorized in the prior year if the Legislature fails to set the amount, etc.
Title
Water Management Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#165 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848 | |
2011-05-07 | Conference Committee Report considered -HJ 1737 | |
2011-05-06 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-06 | Conference Committee Report received -SJ 1141 | |
2011-04-26 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Williams, T. (Chair), Albritton, Artiles, Bembry, Crisafulli, Goodson, Ingram, Porter, Rooney, Sands -HJ 778 | |
2011-04-26 | ||
2011-04-07 | In returning messages | |
2011-04-07 | In Messages | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time -SJ 428 | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -SJ 375, 388 | |
2011-04-05 | Introduced -SJ 332 | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 332 | |
2011-04-01 | SPB 7154 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2142) by Budget |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 536 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 891 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |