FL S2124 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-07 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2000 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends from once every 2 years to once every 3 years the requirement that the department conduct an in-depth review of the assessment roll of each county. Provides for a study of certain classifications constituting 5 percent or more of the total assessed value of real property on the previous assessment roll. Imposes a tax on the charges for the use of coin-operated amusement machines operated on the licensed premises of a pari-mutuel facility located in certain cities or counties, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Revenue

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#157 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2000 (Ch.
2011-04-26 Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Hooper (Chair), Campbell, Costello, Gaetz, Gibbons, Julien, Mayfield, Nelson, Nunez, Patronis -HJ 778
2011-04-26 
2011-04-07 In returning messages
2011-04-07 In Messages
2011-04-07 Read 3rd time -SJ 426
2011-04-06 Read 2nd time -SJ 373
2011-04-05 Introduced -SJ 330
2011-04-04 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 330
2011-04-01 SPB 7136 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2124) by Budget

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
195096Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21369Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback