FL S2118 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a court to assess an additional amount against a defendant who pleads guilty or nolo contendere to, or who is convicted of, violating certain specified offenses, and the services of a criminal analysis laboratory are used in the investigation of the offense. Provides for the proceeds of the assessment to be deposited into the Operating Trust Fund of the Department of Law Enforcement and used by the statewide criminal analysis laboratory system. Repeals provisions relating to the youthful offender basic training program, etc.
Title
Criminal Justice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#176 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848 | |
2011-05-06 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-06 | Conference Committee Report received -SJ 1291 | |
2011-04-26 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Glorioso (Chair), Baxley, Grant, Holder, McBurney, Metz, Nehr, Perry, Pilon, Rouson, Slosberg, Soto -HJ 778 | |
2011-04-26 | ||
2011-04-07 | In returning messages | |
2011-04-07 | In Messages | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time -SJ 424 | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -SJ 372 | |
2011-04-05 | Introduced -SJ 329 | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 329 | |
2011-04-01 | SPB 7122 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2118) by Budget |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 361 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 8041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 0311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
951 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
958 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
958 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |