FL S2116 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes each office of criminal conflict and civil regional counsel to create a direct-support organization. Provides the clerk with the discretion to conduct a review of the county's property records to confirm indigency. Provides for county funding of additional guardian ad litem personnel. Requires an agreement between the county and the Statewide Guardian Ad Litem Office. Requires the clerk of court and the Florida Clerks of Court Operations Corporation to submit reports on local traffic assessments in an electronic format, etc.
Title
State Judicial System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#178 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848 | |
2011-05-07 | Conference Committee Report considered -HJ 1745 | |
2011-05-06 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-06 | Conference Committee Report received -SJ 1288 | |
2011-04-26 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Glorioso (Chair), Baxley, Grant, Holder, McBurney, Metz, Nehr, Perry, Pilon, Rouson, Slosberg, Soto -HJ 778 | |
2011-04-26 | ||
2011-04-07 | In returning messages | |
2011-04-07 | In Messages | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time -SJ 424 | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -SJ 371 | |
2011-04-05 | Introduced -SJ 329 | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 329 | |
2011-04-01 | SPB 7120 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2116) by Budget |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 5304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |