FL S2112 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts a county that provides detention care for preadjudicated juveniles, or that contracts with another county to provide such care, from certain requirements for sharing the costs for juvenile detention. Provides that a county or county sheriff that meets certain prerequisites with respect to the operation of its juvenile detention facility is exempt from certain requirements of law governing the administration of such facilities. Authorizes a county or county sheriff to form regional detention facilities through an interlocal agreement, etc.
Title
Juvenile Detention Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#152 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848 | |
2011-05-07 | Conference Committee Report considered -HJ 1744 | |
2011-05-06 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-06 | Conference Committee Report received -SJ 1286 | |
2011-04-26 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Glorioso (Chair), Baxley, Grant, Holder, McBurney, Metz, Nehr, Perry, Pilon, Rouson, Slosberg, Soto -HJ 778 | |
2011-04-26 | ||
2011-04-07 | In returning messages | |
2011-04-07 | In Messages | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time -SJ 424 | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -SJ 372 | |
2011-04-05 | Introduced -SJ 329 | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 329 | |
2011-04-01 | SPB 7124 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2112) by Budget |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
985 | 686 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 688 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |