FL S2110 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1832
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1832
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the Auditor General conduct operational audits at least every 3 years of certain additional state entities and district school boards and report on the activities of the ad valorem tax program of the Department of Revenue. Revises the duties of the Auditor General with respect to responsibilities for auditing certain reports made to the State Supreme Court and the operations of the Florida Clerks of Court Operations Corporation, respectively. Revises requirements to issue rules for surplus property, etc.
Title
Auditor General
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#166 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1832 | |
2011-05-06 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-06 | Conference Committee Report received -SJ 1189 | |
2011-04-26 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Grimsley (Chair), Aubuchon, Chestnut, Hukill, Kreegel, Legg, Lopez-Cantera, McKeel, Proctor, Rouson, Sands, Saunders, Schenck, Snyder, Weatherford -HJ 778 | |
2011-04-26 | ||
2011-04-07 | In returning messages | |
2011-04-07 | In Messages | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time -SJ 446 | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -SJ 388 | |
2011-04-05 | Introduced -SJ 329 | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 329 | |
2011-04-01 | SPB 7104 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2110) by Budget |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
195 | 096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
273 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
365 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |