FL S2098 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1832
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1832
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the duties of the Agency for Enterprise Information Technology. Deletes references to the Office of Information Security and the Agency Chief Information Officers Council. Requires that the Department of Corrections' Office of Information Technology manage the department's data system. Provides a schedule for the consolidations of state agency data centers. Requires agencies to update their service-level agreements and to develop consolidation plans, etc.
Title
Consolidation/State Information Technology Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#169 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1832 | |
2011-05-06 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-06 | Conference Committee Report received -SJ 1160 | |
2011-04-26 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Grimsley (Chair), Aubuchon, Chestnut, Hukill, Kreegel, Legg, Lopez-Cantera, McKeel, Proctor, Rouson, Sands, Saunders, Schenck, Snyder, Weatherford -HJ 778 | |
2011-04-26 | ||
2011-04-07 | In returning messages | |
2011-04-07 | In Messages | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time -SJ 435 | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -SJ 385 | |
2011-04-05 | Introduced -SJ 326 | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 327 | |
2011-04-01 | SPB 7092 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2098) by Budget |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 0041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 0056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 3055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |