FL S2062 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits monitoring requirements that mandate pornographic materials be available in residential facilities that serve clients of the Agency for Persons with Disabilities. Requires the court to order a person involuntarily admitted to residential services to be released to the agency for appropriate residential services. Forbids the court from ordering that such person be released directly to a residential service provider. Authorizing the agency to transfer a person from one residential setting to another, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Persons with Developmental Disabilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-05-05 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/05/11
2011-05-03 Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 725
2011-04-26 CS by Judiciary read 1st time -SJ 499
2011-04-18 Now in Budget -SJ 470
2011-04-15 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-04-12 CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 470
2011-04-07 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2011-03-30 Now in Judiciary -SJ 308
2011-03-28 Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 -SJ 308
2011-03-24 Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 288
2011-03-23 SPB 7080 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2062) by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9161093Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9163025Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback