FL S2040 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Requires one-stop career center staff to verify the employment eligibility of workers referred to employers using a federal program for electronic verification of employment eligibility. Requires notice to employers on the exception to use of electronic verification. Prohibits an agency from providing federal, state, or local public benefits to certain aliens. Requires an agency to verify the eligibility of applicants for public benefits using the federal Systematic Alien Verification for Entitlements Program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enforcement of Immigration Laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-05-04 In Messages
2011-05-04 Read 3rd time -SJ 790
2011-05-03 Read 2nd time -SJ 738
2011-05-02 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/11
2011-04-29 Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 605
2011-04-14 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/15/11, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2011-04-11 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/14/11, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2011-04-08 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/13/11, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2011-04-06 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-04-04 CS by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 2 -SJ 408
2011-03-30 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/04/11, 3:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2011-03-23 Introduced -SJ 273
2011-03-22 Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 273
2011-03-16 SPB 7066 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2040) by Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
445009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947141Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback