FL S2038 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health and Human Services Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health and Human Services Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for Medicaid eligibility for certain persons with disabilities under a Medicaid buy-in program, subject to specific federal authorization. Requires the DCFS to adopt rules for determining program eligibility. Directs the DOH to perform all disability determinations. Requires the AHCA to establish and administer the buy-in program and to seek amendments to specified Medicaid waivers for certain persons with disabilities.
Title
Medicaid Buy-in Program/Persons with Disabilities [WPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2010-04-08 | Now in Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00523 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00523 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/07/10, 2:30 pm, 401-S | |
2010-03-30 | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 00350 | |
2010-03-29 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-26 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00350; CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -SJ 00363 | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/26/10, 8:00 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Health Regulation; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00138 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Health Regulation; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health and Human Services Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-02-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0837 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC)