FL S2024 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Decreases the rate at which the sales price of certain communications services are taxed. Requires that the State Board of Education make specified adjustments to the figures used by the board in determining the amount of bond debt that can be serviced by revenues derived from the gross receipts tax on utility services. Provides for the act to apply to bills for communications services dated on or after a certain date, etc.
Title
Tax on Communications and Utility Services [WPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0042 - Conference Committee Report (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - House - House Roll Call No. 1131 - Passage (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - House Roll Call No. 0696 - Passage (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0028 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - House - House Roll Call No. 1131 - Passage (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - House Roll Call No. 0696 - Passage (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0028 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-149 | |
2010-05-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-30 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 01586 | |
2010-04-30 | In returning messages; Conference Committee Report received -HJ 01648; Conference Committee Report adopted -HJ 01649; Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 01650 | |
2010-04-30 | Conference Committee Report received -SJ 01212; Conference Committee Report adopted -SJ 01214; Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report (289096); YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 01214 | |
2010-04-19 | Conference Committee appointed: Rivera, Flores, Bullard, Clarke-Reed, Coley, Fresen, Kiar, Legg, Stargel, Proctor, Brise, Burgin, Jones, McKeel, O'Toole, Reed, Glorioso, Gibson, Jenne, Horner, Hukill, Murzin, Rogers, Schenck, Adams, Eisnaugle, Holder, Kreegel, Porth, Rouson, Soto, Tobia, Hays, Abruzzo, Braynon, Gonzalez, Nelson, Ray, Workman, Williams, A., Grimsley, Chestnut, Ford, Frishe, Hudson, Roberson, Y., Skidmore, Thompson, N., Poppell, Bembry, Boyd, Brandenburg, Crisafulli, Plakon, Precourt, Williams, T., Bogdanoff, Aubuchon, Bernard, Carroll, Dorworth, Patronis, Fitzgerald, Thurston, Galvano, Gibbons, Hasner, Lopez-Cantera, Reagan, Sands, Thompson, G., Weatherford, McBurney -HJ 00735 | |
2010-04-16 | Conference Committee appointed: Senators Alexander, Chair; Haridopolos, Vice Chair; Altman, Bennett, Justice, Ring, Storms, At Large; Criminal & Civil Justice: Crist, Chair; Jones, Joyner, Villalobos, Wilson; Education Pre-K-12: Wise, Chair; Bullard, Detert, Garcia, Richter, Siplin; General Government: Baker, Chair; Aronberg, Dean, Lawson, Oelrich; Health & Human Services: Peaden, Chair; Gaetz, Haridopolos, Negron, Rich, Sobel; Higher Education: Lynn, Chair; Constantine, Gelber, Thrasher; Trans & Econ Development: Fasano, Chair; Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Gardiner, Hill, Smith -SJ 00648 | |
2010-04-06 | In returning messages | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00510; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00510; Read 3rd time -HJ 00510; CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 00510; Immediately certified -HJ 00526; Passed the Senate bill as amended by House and we accede to conference -HJ 00526 | |
2010-04-01 | Received -HJ 00474; Referred to Calendar -HJ 00474 | |
2010-03-31 | In Messages | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00402; Amendment(s) adopted (414170) -SJ 00402; Read 3rd time -SJ 00403; CS passed as amended (414170); YEAS 35 NAYS 0 -SJ 00403; Immediately certified -SJ 00403; Requests House concur or failing to concur appoint conference cmte -SJ 00407 | |
2010-03-30 | Original reference(s) removed: Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00370 | |
2010-03-26 | CS by Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -SJ 00350; CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -SJ 00362; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 03/26/10, 10:45 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-22 | On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 03/25/10, 1:30 pm, 412-K --Not considered | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules -SJ 00137 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | |
2010-02-15 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0202 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0202 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0203 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0215 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |