FL S2006 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the "Foreclosure Debt Claims Act." Provides definitions. Authorizes the creation and administration of a deficiency judgment reimbursement program by the Florida Housing Finance Corporation contingent upon the occurrence of certain conditions precedent. Provides for future termination of the program. Authorizes continuation of the program under certain circumstances after depletion of funds. Provides procedures and eligibility requirements for homeowners and financial institutions to file specified monetary claims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foreclosure Debt Relief

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-23 Introduced -SJ 271
2011-03-22 Referred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 271
2011-03-14 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback