FL S1990 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ratifies a specified rule for the sole and exclusive purpose of satisfying any condition on effectiveness established by a provision, which requires ratification of any rule that meets any of the specified thresholds that may likely have an adverse impact or excessive regulatory cost.
Title
Ratification of Rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#38 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-02 | In Messages | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time -SJ 602 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 541 | |
2011-04-26 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 541 | |
2011-04-21 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/26/11, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-04-14 | Now in Rules -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-13 | Favorable by Budget; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/13/11, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-04-07 | Also referred to Rules -SJ 461 | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable by Health Regulation; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 269 | |
2011-03-17 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/22/11, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 252 | |
2011-03-10 | SPB 7060 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1990) by Health Regulation |