FL S1978 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes criminal penalties on a dealer who willfully fails to collect certain taxes or fees after notice of a duty to collect the taxes or fees by the DOR. Revises provisions imposing criminal penalties on a person who makes a false or fraudulent return with a willful intent to evade payment of taxes or fees. Provides criminal penalties for willfully failing to register as a dealer after notice from the DOR, etc.
Title
Violations of Tax Statutes/Criminal Penalties [WPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Finance and Tax | |
2010-04-19 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00650; Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00650 | |
2010-04-14 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/19/10, 1:00 pm, 37-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00134 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-02-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7125 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0212 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |