FL S1964 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Veto Message received (2010-C) -SJ 00004; Veto Message referred to Rules -SJ 00005
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for limited liability for engineers, surveyors and mappers, architects, interior designers, and registered landscape architects as a result of construction defects resulting from the performance of a contract. Provides that, if a contract requires professional liability insurance, the contract may not limit the liability of the design professional inconsistent with the insurance requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Design Professionals [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-28 - House - House Roll Call No. 1021 - Passage (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0004 - Passage (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-20 Veto Message received (2010-C) -SJ 00004; Veto Message referred to Rules -SJ 00005
2010-06-01 Vetoed by Governor
2010-05-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -SJ 00991
2010-04-28 Read 3rd time -HJ 01201; Amendment(s) failed -HJ 01201; CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 2 -HJ 01201
2010-04-27 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01162; Substituted for CS/HB 701 -HJ 01162
2010-04-26 Received -HJ 01110; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01110
2010-04-21 In Messages
2010-04-16 Read 3rd time -SJ 00623; CS passed as amended; YEAS 33 NAYS 4 -SJ 00623
2010-04-15 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00584; Amendment(s) adopted (713430) -SJ 00584; Ordered engrossed -SJ 00584
2010-04-12 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00552
2010-04-09 Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-07 CS/CS by- Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00552; CS read 1st time on 04/14/10 -SJ 00564
2010-04-01 Original reference(s) removed: Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Now in Judiciary -SJ 00413; On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/07/10, 2:00 pm, 110-S
2010-03-25 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-03-24 CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00345; CS read 1st time on 03/25/10 -SJ 00347
2010-03-19 On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/24/10, 1:15 pm, 110-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00132
2010-02-17 Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
2010-02-12 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0701 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 1964 (Vetoed by Governor); Laid on Table -HJ 01162

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0471023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0471046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0472021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04720367New CodeSee Bill Text
0481219Amended CodeSee Bill Text
048123New CodeSee Bill Text
0481319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0481333New CodeSee Bill Text
05580035New CodeSee Bill Text
072508Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=1964&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1964.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1964c1.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1964c2.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1964e1.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1964er.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/SSB19640416100004.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/hSB19640428101021.html

Bill Comments

feedback