FL S1932 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that a person who has lost his or her civil rights and rights to purchase, own, transfer, or use firearms or ammunition based on a felony conviction for an offense other than murder, attempted murder, a violent felony offense, or a felony sexual offense have such disqualifications terminated upon the completion of all terms of his or her sentence; defining the term "violent felony offense", etc.
Title
Restoration of Civil and Firearm Rights
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1932 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1932/BillText/Filed/HTML |