FL S1930 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting specialty license plates marketed and sold by private vendors from certain requirements; requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to contract with certain private vendors through a competitive bidding process for the right to market and sell specialty license plates; requiring a contract to provide for recovery of certain department costs; prohibiting certain actions by the department with respect to private vendors; authorizing dealer and fleet specialty license plates marketed and sold by a private vendor to be ordered directly from the vendor, etc.
Title
Specialty License Plates Marketed and Sold by Private Vendors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1862 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Transportation
H1267 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
H1269 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
H1267 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
H1269 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1930 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1930/BillText/Filed/HTML |