FL S1928 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing February 25, 2018, as "St. Johns River State College Day" and commemorating the college's 60th anniversary, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

St. Johns River State College Day

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21SenateAdopted
2018-02-21SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced
2018-02-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H8045 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Adopted by Publication

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback