FL S1906 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the State Constitution to authorize counties and municipalities to freeze the assessed value of the homesteads of certain low-income senior citizens.
Title
Homestead Assessed Value/Low-income Senior Citizen
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-22 | Introduced -SJ 243 | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules -SJ 243 | |
2011-03-05 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1906 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1906/BillText/Filed/HTML |