FL S1900 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions relating to acquisition of controlling stock with respect to stock and mutual insurers. Provides that a person may not acquire a domestic stock insurer or a controlling company unless such person has filed with the commissioner and sent to the insurer a statement containing specified information and the offer, request, invitation, agreement, or acquisition has been approved by the Commissioner of Insurance. Authorizes the commissioner to retain attorneys and experts in reviewing the proposed acquisition of control, etc.
Title
Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-22 | Introduced -SJ 241 | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Budget -SJ 242 | |
2011-03-05 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 310 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
625 | 765 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 7452 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 7492 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 918 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9928 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 4615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 252 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 3073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 4085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
636 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
642 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1900 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1900/BillText/Filed/HTML |