FL S1896 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Congress of the United States to support any commercial, civil, military, or academic endeavor, including job training and placement, which will enable the United States space program to maintain, to the greatest extent possible, our nation's only human space flight workforce.
Title
Commercial, Civil, Military, or Academic Endeavors [CPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] | Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0004 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State | |
2010-04-21 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 00720 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted for CS/HM 1199 -HJ 00816; Read 2nd time -HJ 00816; Adopted -HJ 00817 | |
2010-04-19 | Received -HJ 00756; Referred to Calendar -HJ 00756 | |
2010-04-16 | In Messages | |
2010-04-15 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00579; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading; Placed on Special Order Calendar -SJ 00579; Read 2nd time -SJ 00579; Adopted; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00579 | |
2010-03-04 | Now in Rules -SJ 00189 | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable by Commerce; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00189 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Commerce; Rules -SJ 00128; On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 03/03/10, 3:15 pm, 401-S | |
2010-02-26 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 03/03/10, 3:15 pm, 401-S | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Commerce; Rules | |
2010-02-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1199 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SM 1896; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SM 1896 (Adopted) -HJ 00816