FL S1892 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Emergency Preparedness and Response Fund within the Executive Office of the Governor; providing for the deposit and use of funds; providing for future review and termination of the fund, etc.
Title
Emergency Preparedness and Response Fund
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security Committee | Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#365 (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8) | |
2021-06-01 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-28 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 1 |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-26 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021) |
2021-04-26 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-22 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/01/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/31/21, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2021-03-25 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Appropriations |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/23/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1595 (Same As) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2006 (Ch. 2021-8)
S2006 (Similar To) 2021-05-03 - Chapter No. 2021-8
S2006 (Similar To) 2021-05-03 - Chapter No. 2021-8