FL S1886 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting introduction into or possession on the grounds of any county detention facility of any cellular telephone or other portable communication device under certain circumstances; defining the term "portable communication device", etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contraband in County Detention Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-23SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-02-21SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-02-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-20SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/20/18, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2018-01-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H733 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1220 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95122Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback