FL S1884 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Chapter No. 2021-15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that written or unwritten policies are subject to provisions allowing for recovery of damages if such policies violate specified provisions; providing that a plaintiff challenging a local government regulation concerning firearms is considered a prevailing plaintiff for certain purposes in specified circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preemption of Firearms and Ammunition Regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#349 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#348 (Y: 78 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11 Chapter No. 2021-15
2021-05-07 Approved by Governor
2021-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-28HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-28SenateOrdered enrolled
2021-04-28HousePassed; YEAS 78, NAYS 39
2021-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-27HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 201869 ruled out of order
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 584915 Failed
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 293023 Failed
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 268287 withdrawn
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 542025 withdrawn
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 103781 withdrawn
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 542025 filed
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 103781 filed
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 201869 filed
2021-04-26House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-04-26HouseAmendment 268287 filed
2021-04-26HouseAmendment 584915 filed
2021-04-26HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021)
2021-04-26HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-26HouseAmendment 293023 filed
2021-04-26HouseIn Messages
2021-04-26SenatePassed; YEAS 24 NAYS 16
2021-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-22SenateAmendment(s) failed (139146, 777678)
2021-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-20SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 6
2021-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-30SenateNow in Rules
2021-03-29SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 4
2021-03-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/29/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-16SenateNow in Judiciary
2021-03-16SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
2021-03-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/16/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2021-03-10SenateIntroduced
2021-03-04SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2021-02-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1409 (Same As) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 1884

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
79033Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Amendment/777678/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Amendment/139146/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Amendment/293023/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Amendment/584915/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Amendment/268287/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Amendment/103781/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Amendment/542025/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Amendment/201869/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Analyses/2021s01884.pre.ca.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Analyses/2021s01884.ca.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Analyses/2021s01884.pre.ju.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Analyses/2021s01884.ju.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Analyses/2021s01884.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Analyses/2021s01884.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Vote/SenateVote_s01884__018.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Vote/HouseVote_s01884__348.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Vote/HouseVote_s01884__349.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Vote/2021-03-16%200900AM~S01884%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Vote/2021-03-29%200330PM~S01884%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1884/Vote/2021-04-20%200830AM~S01884%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback