FL S1884 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 29
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing requirements relating to licensure or qualification of persons ordered into active duty or state active duty; revising provisions relating to receiving training grants from Florida is for Veterans, Inc.; requiring the Division of State Fire Marshal to waive certain expenses associated with attending the Florida State Fire College; designating March 25 of each year as "Medal of Honor Day", etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military and Veterans Affairs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-02SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 29
2018-03-02SenateSubstituted CS/HB 29
2018-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-26SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-02-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-23SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-22SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-01SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-02-01SenateFavorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/01/18, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H29 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Chapter No. 2018-7
H699 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
H949 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
H1047 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H1073 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-102
H1191 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
S1090 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
S1198 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
S1292 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1073
S1486 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
S1566 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100237Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100342Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101259Amended CodeSee Bill Text
250483Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
472015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
472016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49400312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49400313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497140Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497281Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497368Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497369Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497370Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497371Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497373Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497374Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497375Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497393Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497453Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497466Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497554Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
52702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
539001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559928Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626732Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6267355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6267851Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6268311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6268417Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6268732Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6268734Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626927Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269272Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633332Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633444Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64834Amended CodeSee Bill Text
648355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
683147Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback