FL S1876 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1165
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that moneys received from specified penalties be allocated to certain trauma centers by a calculation that uses the Agency for Health Care Administration's hospital discharge data; revising the trauma service areas and provisions relating to the number and location of trauma centers; requiring the Department of Health to periodically prepare an analysis of the state trauma system using the agency's hospital discharge data and specified population data; requiring trauma centers to participate in the National Trauma Data Bank, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trauma Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1165
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 1165
2018-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-01SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-01SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 9 NAYS 4
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-26SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-02-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-23SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-23SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-22SenateCS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 3
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/14/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-26SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-01-24SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2018-01-24SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-23SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations; Rules
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1165 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-66

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3954001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3954025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3954036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409975Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback