FL S1872 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Commissioner of Insurance Regulation to convene a task force for specified purposes; requiring the task force to deliver a biennial report beginning on a certain date, etc.
Title
Insurance-based Climate-change Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1623 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1872 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1872/BillText/Filed/HTML |